Soares et al v. Flowers Foods, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mark Soares and Brian Botelho
Defendant: Flowers Foods, Inc., Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto, Flowers Bakeries Brands, Inc. and Flowers Baking Co. of California
Case Number: 4:2015cv04918
Filed: October 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER.Fact Discovery Cut-Off: December 14, 2017. Deadline for Hearing Dispositive Motions: March 22, 2018. Expert Witness Disclosures: June 8, 2018. Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures: July 6, 2018. Expert Discovery Cutoff: July 27, 2 018. Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 9/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 9/11/2018 to 9/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/15/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
June 28, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 61 Motion to Certify Class. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
July 15, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/15/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
January 26, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE SCHEDULING ORDER re 33 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 26, 2016 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soares et al v. Flowers Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Bakeries Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Soares
Represented By: Valerie Jean Brender
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: Beth A. Ross
Represented By: Peter Scott Rukin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Botelho
Represented By: Valerie Jean Brender
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: Beth A. Ross
Represented By: Peter Scott Rukin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?