Elam et al v. National Mediation Board et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Thompson and Tim Elam
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 4:2015cv05127
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/28/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 14, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. granting 39 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and denying plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 49 . Compliance hearing set for Friday, 12/9/2016 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Proposed form of judgment filed by 12/2/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
July 5, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 40 Motion to Dismiss; granting 45 Stipulation for Extension to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elam et al v. National Mediation Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?