DeWitt v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Timothy A. DeWitt
Defendant: Paul Ryan, California Citizens Redistricting Commission, Alex Padilla, Arnold Schwarzenegger and Scott S. Harris
Case Number: 4:2015cv05261
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR THREE-JUDGE PANEL Responses due by 4/22/2016 at Noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/15/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 4, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/11/2016 at NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/4/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 14, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup denying 21 .(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016) Modified on 3/14/2016 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. William Alsup denying 18 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
January 12, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER SUA SPONTE DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT A THREE-JUDGE PANEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
December 23, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONVENE A THREE-JUDGE PANEL 5 MOTION : Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/23/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeWitt v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy A. DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Citizens Redistricting Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?