Johnson v. Piccolo Properties LP et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Piccolo Properties LP, Carmelo Piccolo and Res-Care, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv05491
Filed: December 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE this case is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this court, within 60 days, with proof of service of a copy thereon to opposing counsel, that the agreed cons ideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this case shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/9/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 10, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Discharging 28 Order to Show Cause, Continuing Hearing on 22 First MOTION to Stay & Early Evaluation Conference filed by Piccolo Properties LP, Carmelo Piccolo to 3/10/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/10/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
January 27, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 1/29/2016. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/27/2016. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Piccolo Properties LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr.
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark Dee Potter
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piccolo Properties LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmelo Piccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Res-Care, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Alexander Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?