Daniellle Parker v. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Parker
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv05673
Filed: December 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying Award of Costs. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/26/17. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 50 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/25/17. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 56 4/21/17 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Plaintiff's Deposition Changes. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Plaintiff's 54 4/19/17 Motion to Compel Compliance with Court Order; ORDER denying Plaintiff's 55 4/21/17 Motion to Allow the Completion of Depositions. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating Defendant's 51 Motion to Strike Deposition Changes. Parties are to meet and confer and, if necessary, file a joint letter by 4/21/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting limited extension to file discovery disputes. Parties have until 04/20/17 to file discovery disputes that could not have been filed earlier due to lack of necessary deposition transcripts. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/17/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Plaintiff's 48 4/11/2017 Discovery Letter Brief as untimely. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 42 4/3/17 Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER regarding 39 , 40 Discovery Letter Briefs re: Plaintiff's noticed deposition. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/24/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER terminating 34 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Permission to File Joint Letter on Discovery Disputes filed by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, in light of 36 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/5/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/4/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MODIFIED ORDER granting 24 Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time to Submit Initial Disclosures and Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/16/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniellle Parker v. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Represented By: Marianne C. Koepf
Represented By: Mark Steven Spring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Parker
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?