Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Rudig et al

Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Jorg H Rudig, Nicole Dupuis, Shayna Massa, Ursula Rudig and Michael Shillington
Case Number: 4:2015cv05791
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Re 24 . Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2016; Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2016 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/7/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
February 29, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
January 12, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Motion to Deposit Funds. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Rudig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James Andrew Hazlehurst
Represented By: Robert Edward Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorg H Rudig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Dupuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shayna Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula Rudig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shillington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?