Misle v. Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Howard Misle
Defendant: Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv06031
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART, 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 25, 2017. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
February 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER RESERVING RULING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 19, 2017. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2017)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART 62 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 17, 2017. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/15/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference.Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/14/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/6/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misle v. Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Misle
Represented By: Gregory Aker
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Pappy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?