Haley et al v. Macy's, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kristin Haley and Sylvia Thompson
Defendant: Macy's, Inc. and Bloomingdale's, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv06033
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2017 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 78 Stipulation Continuing Hearing for Defendants ( 61 , 63 )Motions to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
September 18, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 72 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motions to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
July 7, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 41 MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE. Amended Pleadings due by 7/28/2017.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
December 9, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 3, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Stipulation Re Docket No. 36 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
October 17, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 35 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference re 34 Clerk's Notice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
September 7, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. RELATING CASE AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART (docket no. 21 in in case 3:15-cv-06033-HSG) MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND APPOINT INTERIM COUNSEL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
July 1, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (27) in case 3:15-cv-06033-HSG; (12) in case 3:16-cv-01252-HSG; (10) in case 3:16-cv-02850-HSG Stipulation Re Schedule For Case Management Conference and Defendants' Response Deadline. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 20, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Motion to Relate Case to 16-cv-2850-KAW.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016) Modified on 6/20/2016 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Motion to Relate Case to 16-cv-1252-DMR.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 17, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Parsons, Brian.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
February 29, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 13 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haley et al v. Macy's, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Haley
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Thompson
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomingdale's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?