Moss v. SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL AND TRAUMA CENTER et al

Plaintiff: Nicole Moss
Defendant: SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL AND TRAUMA CENTER, City and County of San Francisco Department of Public Health and City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 4:2016cv00072
Filed: January 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline to Mediate Under General Order 56 filed by Nicole Moss, City and County of San Francisco, ***Deadlines terminated. 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline to Mediate Under General Order 56 filed by Nicole Moss, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/27/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
March 10, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline to Mediate Under General Order 56 filed by Nicole Moss, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/10/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
October 13, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES UNDER GENERAL ORDER 56 filed by Nicole Moss, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/13/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
July 7, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES UNDER GENERAL ORDER 56 filed by Nicole Moss, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/7/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
July 6, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/20/2016.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/06/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
May 24, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER denying 19 MOTION to Relate Case filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/24/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
April 12, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend time to file response to plaintiff's complaint filed by Nicole Moss, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/12/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL AND TRAUMA CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Moss
Represented By: Celia Louise McGuinness
Represented By: Paul Leslie Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL AND TRAUMA CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco Department of Public Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?