Goertzen v. Great American Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Joyce Goertzen
Defendant: Great American Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv00240
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2018 86 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING CLASS SETTLEMENT; AWARDING CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE AWARD, AWARDING CLASS COUNSEL FEES AND EXPENSES AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE re 79 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Joyce Goertzen; DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/28/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
November 6, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 74 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Motion for Final Approval and Motion for approval of Class Counsel fees, expenses and class representative service awards filed by 1/5/2018. Fairness Hearing set for 3/27/2018 02:00 PM. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
August 1, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTER; REFERRING PRIVILEGE DISPUTE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, ORDER REFERRING to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes, ORDER REFERRING MOTION: re Documents withheld on grounds of privilege in 65 Joint Discovery Letter Brief and Attachment filed by Joyce Goertzen. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/1/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 11, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/11/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
June 1, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 11, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR REMAND. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 47 First MOTION to Remand. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/11/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 17, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 17 Stipulation selecting Private ADR : Private Mediation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goertzen v. Great American Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Goertzen
Represented By: Ingrid M. Evans
Represented By: Michael Aaron Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas A. Evans
Represented By: Rachel Adi Naor
Represented By: Robert D. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?