Stephanie Pamintuan v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Plaintiff: Stephanie Pamintuan
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. and Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00254
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2734) - UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION. The actions listed on Schedule A (3:16-cv-00254-HSG Stephanie Pamintuan v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et all) and pending outside the Northern District of Florida are transferred to the Northern District of Floridaand, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable M.Casey Rodgers for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. In re: Abilify (Aripiprazole) Product Liability Litigation. ***CAND Civil Case Terminated. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
July 19, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Munir R. Meghjee. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 14, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ( 12 , 20 ) PRO HAC VICE ADMISSIONS AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO FILE AMENDED APPLICATIONS. Attorneys Megan J McKenzie and Munir R. Meghjee terminated. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/14/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
May 18, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Matthew A. Campbell. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 12, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Matthew Eisenstein. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 6, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 42 Stipulation Extend Time to File Reply re 26 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
April 11, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Rand K. Brothers.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
March 31, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Luke A. Connelly.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 30, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
February 17, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Meghjee, Munir. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 16, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Stipulation to Extend Time (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 2, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephanie Pamintuan v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Pamintuan
Represented By: Megan J McKenzie
Represented By: Gary Lester Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Krista M. Enns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Krista M. Enns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?