Sosa-Lopez et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Maria E. Sosa-Lopez and David E. Lopez
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and NBS Default Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv00262
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating motion to dismiss. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This CMC will be vacated once a stipulation for dismissal is filed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/19/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
February 10, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Affirming NBS Status filed by NBS Default Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
January 26, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference to be completed by 2/15/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/26/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sosa-Lopez et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria E. Sosa-Lopez
Represented By: Marc Steven Applbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Lopez
Represented By: Marc Steven Applbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBS Default Services, LLC
Represented By: Stephen T. Hicklin
Represented By: Robert Betuel Norum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?