Gurrola et al v. Antioch Unified School District

Plaintiff: Vanessa Gurrola and J. R.
Defendant: Antioch Unified School District
Case Number: 4:2016cv00308
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/22/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
August 23, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/23/2016 02:00 PM.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/23/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 5, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Telephone Conference set for 8/9/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Settlement Conference set for 9/6/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/5/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurrola et al v. Antioch Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Gurrola
Represented By: Nicole Hodge Amey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. R.
Represented By: Nicole Hodge Amey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antioch Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?