Huweih v. US Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust et al

Plaintiff: Amal Huweih
Defendant: US Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and Summit Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv00421
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION AND FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. The Notice of Pendency of Action recorded December 21, 2015, in the Alameda County Recorder's office as instrument no. 2015332629 is ordered expunged. Defendants are awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $1050. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/31/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 30, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND. Should plaintiff wish to file an amended pleading, her First Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than February 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/30/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 20, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXPUNGE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 12, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/12/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
November 15, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/15/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 4, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/4/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
August 10, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to September 9, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 10, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
July 5, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO AUGUST 12, 2016; DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 5, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
May 2, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The request for a continuance is granted, and the Case Management Conference is continued to July 8, 2016. An updated Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than July 1, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 2, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
February 11, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE; SUSPENDING BRIEFING AND VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. In light of the reference, the briefing schedule on defendant's motion to dismiss, filed February 1, 2016, is suspended, and the March 11, 2016 hearing date on said motion is vacated, pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2016. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huweih v. US Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amal Huweih
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Management Company, LLC
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?