Brendan Huerta v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Brendan Huerta
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture and Agriculture Research Service
Case Number: 4:2016cv00434
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 81 Motion to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 83 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 81 MOTION Requesting Court Decline to Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction Over State Law Claims filed by Brendan Huerta, Akima Facilities Management, LLC. Set/Rese t Deadlines as to 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 81 MOTION Requesting Court Decline to Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction Over State Law Claims , 81 MOTION Requesting Court Decline to Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction Over State Law Claims. Responses due by 10/9/2017. Replies due by 10/16/2017. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/27/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 76 Clerk's Notice. to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Brendan Huerta, Akima Facilities Management, LLC. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/19/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 55 Motion to Set Aside Default;denying as moot 47 Motion for Default Judgment and 50 Motion for Default Judgment. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 38 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by November 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/26/2016. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER vacating mediation deadline and continuing case management conference filed by Agriculture Research Service, Brendan Huerta, United States Department of Agriculture Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/2/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER withdrawing motion to dismiss and allowing filing of amended complaint filed by Agriculture Research Service, Brendan Huerta, United States Department of Agriculture, Mo tions terminated: 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER withdrawing motion to dismiss and allowing filing of amended complaint filed by Agriculture Research Service, Brendan Huerta, United States Department of Agriculture, 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Agriculture Research Service, United States Department of Agriculture.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/28/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER extending mediation deadline filed by Agriculture Research Service, United States Department of Agriculture. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/21/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Agriculture Research Service, Brendan Huerta, United States Department of Agriculture, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER , 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 5/20/2016. Replies due by 6/7/2016.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/8/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2016 at 01:30 PM. Motion Hearing continued to 7/7/2016 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 03/30/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by United States Department of Agriculture filed by Brendan Huerta, United States Department of Agriculture, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/14/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brendan Huerta v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Huerta
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agriculture Research Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?