Stavedahl v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Howard Stavedahl
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2016cv00475
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint, of Dismissal with Prejudice and Order Thereon filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
August 12, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 To Continue The August 18, 2016 Case Management Conference to November 17, 2016 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/12/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
April 15, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stavedahl v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Stavedahl
Represented By: Steven Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?