Barnes v. Energy Recovery, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Barnes
Defendant: Energy Recovery, Inc., Thomas Rooney and Joel Gay
Case Number: 4:2016cv00477
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2016 127 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 126 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal filed by David Barnes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
July 19, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order. As described in the attached order, the court allows the plaintiff to question Mr. Gay about whether the alleged misrepresentations made by Mr. Rooney factored into his separation from ERI. The discovery is allowed to facilitate t he upcoming mediation on July 28 and (with the parties' agreement) is designated confidential under the protective order absent stipulation of the parties or further order of the court. The court allows some flexibility in questioning but expect s the questioning to be tethered to the representations made to Mr. Barnes before and during his employment at ERI, whether Mr. Rooney made those representations elsewhere (whether to the public or internally in the company), and whether those representations factored into Mr. Rooney's separation from ERI. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 1, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 91 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Thomas Rooney, Joel Gay, Energy Recovery, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 10, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION: Re 77 Notice (Other) filed by Thomas Rooney, Joel Gay, Energy Recovery, Inc. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/10/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
March 11, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 34 Amended Complaint Modifying Responsive Pleading Deadline filed by Thomas Rooney, Joel Gay, Energy Recovery, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
February 25, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 26 . Deadlines extended re: 14 Motion for Return of Property Modifying Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's Reply due by 3/9/2016. Defendant's Responses due by 3/2/2016. Hearing date is not changed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/25/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Energy Recovery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: Juan Carlos Araneda
Represented By: David Ward Olin Gearhart
Represented By: Jason Alex Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Rooney
Represented By: David Ward Olin Gearhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Gay
Represented By: David Ward Olin Gearhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Barnes
Represented By: Christopher David Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?