Johnson v. Carter et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Peter L. Carter and Source Tube & Hose, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00502
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 5/30/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
November 4, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/4/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
October 11, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Case Management Conference for 11/1/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/11/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Mark Dee Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter L. Carter
Represented By: Michael David Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Source Tube & Hose, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?