Hardeman v. Monsanto Company et al

Plaintiff: Edward Hardeman
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv00525
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 139: FINAL PHASE 2 INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on March 26, 2019. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 135: COURT'S REVISED PHASE 2 INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on March 25, 2019. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 127: COURT'S DRAFT PHASE 2 INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on March 24, 2019. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 116: ORDER RE DESIGN DEFECT CLAIM. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/18/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 113: ORDER DENYING MONSANTO'S MOTION FOR A DIRECTED VERDICT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/13/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 108: FINAL PHASE 1 INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on March 12, 2019. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 104: SCOPE OF DR. ARBER'S TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on March 7, 2019. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 15: THIRD-PARTY DISCOVERY AND PENDING MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 3/13/2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REGARDING POSSIBLE APPOINTMENT OF AN INDEPENDENT EXPERT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/20/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SCHEDULING ORDER. Dispositive and Daubert Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/24/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardeman v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hardeman
Represented By: Kathryn Miller Forgie
Represented By: Aimee Wagstaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Richard Alden Clark
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Represented By: Eric Gordon Lasker
Represented By: Katharine R. Latimer
Represented By: Steven Robert Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?