In re: Joseph Michael Cagno

Appellant: David Sturgeon-Garcia
Appellee: Joseph Michael Cagno
Case Number: 4:2016cv00526
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING BANKRUPTCY COURT re 10 Appellant's Brief. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/29/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
February 14, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCINDING ORDER STRIKING BRIEFS re 16 Order. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/14/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 13, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER re 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL & SCHEDULING ORDER and 3 MOTION for Clarification/Amendment of Scheduling Order re Appellate Briefs filed by David Sturgeon-Garcia. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/13/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 2, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING BRIEFS re 10 Appellant's Brief, 14 Appellee's Brief, 15 Appellant's Reply Brief; the Briefs are hereby STRICKEN. Meet and confer by 2/10/17. Compliance hearing for submission of update set 2/17/2017 at 9:01am. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/2/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
February 23, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER re 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL & SCHEDULING ORDER, 3 MOTION for Clarification/Amendment of Scheduling Order re Appellate Briefs filed by David Sturgeon-Garcia. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/23/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Joseph Michael Cagno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David Sturgeon-Garcia
Represented By: David Sturgeon-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joseph Michael Cagno
Represented By: Roger Brian Irion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?