Badrei v. Target Corporation

Plaintiff: Andichech Badrei
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 4:2016cv00649
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to dismiss filed by Target Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
May 23, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 6/15/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 11/14/2016. Expert disclosures 11/30/2016. Expert rebuttal 12/16/2016. Expert discovery cut-off 1/13/2017. Deadline to file dispositive moti ons 1/27/2107. Pretrial conference statement due 4/11/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 23, 2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2017 AT 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 5/15/2017 - 5/22/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
March 29, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Target Corporation and Plaintiff filed by Target Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
February 23, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Badrei v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Gail C. Trabish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andichech Badrei
Represented By: Michael Scott Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?