Mazonas et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al

Plaintiff: Peter Mazonas and Marica Mazonas
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Bank of America, N.A. and Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 4:2016cv00660
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal Of Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/28/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
September 15, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/17/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 11/14/2016.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
July 21, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 40 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2016 AT 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 20, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 38 OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/20/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
June 9, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Deadline to Answer Complaint. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 6/16/2016 Continued to 8/11/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/9/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 5, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 33 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 4, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/4/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazonas et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Mazonas
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marica Mazonas
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Gurinder Singh Grewal
Represented By: Erik Wayne Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?