Mullen v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Kevin Mullen
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 4:2016cv00848
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REMAND AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Voluntary Remand filed by Kevin Mullen, Carolyn W. Colvin, ***Civil Case Terminated., ORDER REMANDING CASE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/6/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
September 21, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition filed by Kevin Mullen, Carolyn W. Colvin, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition, 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 10/17/2016. Replies due by 10/24/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/21/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
August 2, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition filed by Kevin Mullen, Carolyn W. Colvin, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 13 ST IPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition, 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 9/15/2016. Replies due by 9/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/2/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullen v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Mullen
Represented By: Nancy E. McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Timothy R. Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?