Christensen v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: Paul Christensen
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co. N.A.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00976
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 12:1461
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/13/2016. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
April 5, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 10 Ex Parte Application.(pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
March 30, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re second petition to restrain foreclosure sale. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/30/2016. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
February 29, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re petition to restrain foreclosure sale. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/29/2016. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Christensen
Represented By: Peter Leo Kutrubes
Represented By: Stephen Pei-jing Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co. N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?