Mission Trading Company, Inc. v. Lewis et al

Plaintiff: Mission Trading Company, Inc.
Defendant: David Vincent Lewis and Sandra Gallagher Lewis
Case Number: 4:2016cv01110
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 42 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
September 13, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 14 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
August 15, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 29 Motion to Set Aside Default. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
July 25, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 29 First MOTION to Set Aside Default (Dkt. 25) filed by David Vincent Lewis. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
June 20, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 14 MOTION to Strike 8 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaim, Causes of Action & Prayer MOTION to Dismiss Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaim, Causes of Action & Prayer MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Mission Trading Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mission Trading Company, Inc. v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mission Trading Company, Inc.
Represented By: Sunita Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Vincent Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Gallagher Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?