Kaar et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association

Plaintiff: Sylvester S. Kaar and Linda S. Kaar
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2016cv01290
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 45 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME TO OPPOSE MOTION TO DISMISS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
June 1, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 31, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 27 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 11, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 5, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 11 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaar et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester S. Kaar
Represented By: Marcus T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda S. Kaar
Represented By: Marcus T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Jeremy E Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?