George E. Sloan v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: George Sloan
Defendant: Wellsfargo Home Mortgage/Wachovia Mortgage, FSB
Case Number: 4:2016cv01333
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Response to Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/11/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 5, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 Amended Complaint, terminating 9 Motion to Dismiss, and denying 24 Motion to Strike. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 18, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court vacates the hearing set for Wednesday, May 11, 2016. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/18/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
March 22, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring case to ADR Unit for Early Initial Screening Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/22/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George E. Sloan v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellsfargo Home Mortgage/Wachovia Mortgage, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?