Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc. v. Leland Stanford Junior University, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc.
Defendant: Leland Stanford Junior University, Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University, Alumni Association of Chi Theta Chi House, Board of Directors of Alumni Association of Chi Theta Chi House and Thomas Abel Allison
Case Number: 4:2016cv01336
Filed: March 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2016 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR deadlines. Briefing schedules, including ADR and other deadlines remain unchanged. See Civil L.R. 7-7(d). Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/rmworders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 24, 2016 11 Featured Case ORDER Granting 10 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Christopher G. Oprison counsel for Plaintiff Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/24/2016.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 22, 2016 10 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY Christopher Oprison to appear PRO HAC VICE (CIVIL LOCAL RULE 11-3); (Proposed) Order ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10308619.) filed by Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc.. (Oprison, Christopher) (Filed on 3/22/2016) Modified on 3/22/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2016 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case.Signed by the Executive Committee on March 22, 2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 21, 2016 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc... (Mandell, Joshua) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 18, 2016 6 Summons Issued as to Alumni Association of Chi Theta Chi House, a California tax exempt corporation, aka Chi Theta Chi, aka Alpha Epsilon Chapter of Theta Chi Fraternity, Leland Stanford Junior University, a private, research institution of higher learning, The Board of Directors of Alumni Association of Chi Theta Chi House, The Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University, custodian of the endowment and all University Property, Thomas Abel Allison, individually and as President/Director of Alumni Association of Chi Theta Chi House. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 18, 2016 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2016 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 18, 2016 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 4/1/2016. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 18, 2016 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc. (Mandell, Joshua) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 18, 2016 2 Proposed Summons. (Mandell, Joshua) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 18, 2016 1 COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10301437.). Filed byTheta Chi Fraternity, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4 to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mandell, Joshua) (Filed on 3/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc. v. Leland Stanford Junior University, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theta Chi Fraternity, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Robert Mandell
Represented By: Christopher G. Oprison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland Stanford Junior University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alumni Association of Chi Theta Chi House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Directors of Alumni Association of Chi Theta Chi House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Abel Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?