Stewart et al v. Xinchang Zhongke Electric Co., Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas E. Stewart and H. Alice Chen
Defendant: Xinchang Zhongke Electric Co., Ltd., Xinchang Thundereagle Co., Ltd., Shenzhou Howrich Import & Export Co., Ltd. and Brenda Xing
Case Number: 4:2016cv01407
Filed: March 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/23/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
October 5, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SERVE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/5/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
June 20, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER QUASHING SERVICE re 19 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by H. Alice Chen, Nicholas E. Stewart, 17 Order to Show Cause,, Set Deadlines,. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/20/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
April 11, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. Xinchang Zhongke Electric Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas E. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Alice Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xinchang Zhongke Electric Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xinchang Thundereagle Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhou Howrich Import & Export Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Xing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?