Sunrise Specialty Company, Inc. v. Scottsdale Insurance Company,

Plaintiff: Sunrise Specialty Company, Inc. and Robert Weinstein
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv01461
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 33 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 26, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Scottsdale Insurance Company against Sunrise Specialty Company, Inc., Robert Weinstein (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
June 21, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Motion to Appear by Telephone at CMC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 20, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 10, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 10 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunrise Specialty Company, Inc. v. Scottsdale Insurance Company,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Louis Harrison Castoria
Represented By: Marcus M Dong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunrise Specialty Company, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Louis Martini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Weinstein
Represented By: Alan Louis Martini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?