United States v. VA Partners I, LLC et al

Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: VA Partners I, LLC, ValueAct Capital Master Fund, L.P. and ValueAct Co-Invest International, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2016cv01672
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT 50 by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
July 18, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CASE DEADLINES, Motions terminated: 41 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines filed by United States of America. Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/18/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 1, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ***CORRECTED*** STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 30, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO INCREASE PAGE LIMITS FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 29 Administrative Motion to extend page limits.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
May 27, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING by Hon. William Alsup granting 27 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 24, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 25 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. VA Partners I, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Brian Edward Hanna
Represented By: Robert Austin Lepore
Represented By: Joseph Chandra Mazumdar
Represented By: Tai Snow Milder
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VA Partners I, LLC
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Andrew Zenner Michaelson
Represented By: Edward J. Normand
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ValueAct Capital Master Fund, L.P.
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Andrew Zenner Michaelson
Represented By: Edward J. Normand
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ValueAct Co-Invest International, L.P.
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Andrew Zenner Michaelson
Represented By: Edward J. Normand
Represented By: Beko Osiris Ra Reblitz-Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?