Wilson v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Anthony F. Wilson
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 4:2016cv01971
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. This matter is remanded to the Agency for further proceedings. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/09/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
November 14, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Reset Deadlines as to 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response due by 12/12/2016. Reply due by 12/26/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/14/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
April 18, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/18/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony F. Wilson
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Sharon Lahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?