Lopez Juarez v. Citibank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Fortunato Lopez Juarez
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2016cv01984
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/15/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
September 1, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 13 Motion to Dismiss. Citibank shall answer within fourteen days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 23, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
July 5, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/05/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 16, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 STIPULATION to Reset Deadlines as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 7/8/2016. Reply due by 7/22/2016. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/16/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
April 18, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/18/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Juarez v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortunato Lopez Juarez
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Marcos D. Sasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?