Jordan v. The Presidio Trust et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Jordan
Defendant: The Presidio Trust and The U.S. Equal Opportunity Commission
Case Number: 4:2016cv02122
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 15:53
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 63 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
May 31, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 68 Order,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Victoria Lipnic, Jean S Fraser, The U.S. Equal Opportunity Commission, The Presidio Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/31/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
January 30, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 39 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
November 10, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 12/5/2016. Replies due by 12/19/2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/10/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
September 27, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER : Second Stipulated Request to Modify Briefing Schedule filed by The U.S. Equal Opportunity Commission, Patricia Jordan, The Presidio Trust Motions to be filed by 9/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/27/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 21, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER : Stipulated Request to Modify Briefing Schedule filed by The U.S. Equal Opportunity Commission, Patricia Jordan, The Presidio Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/21/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. The Presidio Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Jordan
Represented By: Timothy Squire Thimesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Presidio Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The U.S. Equal Opportunity Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?