Kinney v. Gutierrez et al
Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Defendant: Philip Gutierrez, Michele Clark, David Marcus and Eric Chomsky
Case Number: 4:2016cv02278
Filed: April 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 39 Amended Motion to Transfer Case; granting 24 Motion to Transfer Case. The court grants the defendants' motion to transfer and transfers this case to the Central District of California. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/4/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/21/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney v. Gutierrez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Represented By: Charles G. Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?