Jacks v. City of Hayward et al

Plaintiff: Jabali Jacks
Defendant: City of Hayward, Rick Tran, James Javier and Jason Faria
Case Number: 4:2016cv02300
Filed: April 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/13/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
September 28, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 for PROTECTION filed by Jason Faria, Rick Tran, City of Hayward, James Javier. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/28/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
July 22, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 8, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/8/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
May 3, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/3/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacks v. City of Hayward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabali Jacks
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Javier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Faria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?