Alvarez-Garcia v. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings

Plaintiff: Jessica Alvarez-Garcia
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Case Number: 4:2016cv02395
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/23/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
September 13, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 20 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
June 14, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 4 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 6, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez-Garcia v. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Represented By: Saman M. Rejali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Alvarez-Garcia
Represented By: Eric M. Lightman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?