Bryde et al v. General Motors, LLC

Plaintiff: Philip Bryde, Jennifer Waters and Alvin Northington
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv02421
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERTO CONTINUE ADR COMPLETION DATE AND MODIFY SCHEDULE granting 43 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/27/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
November 17, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick denying 22 Motion to Strike and 24 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
August 19, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to 22 MOTION to Strike, 13 MOTION to Dismiss, 24 MOTION to Dismiss, 16 MOTION to Strike. Responses due by 9/16/2016. Replies due by 9/30/2016. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/19/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
June 30, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE granting 19 STIPULATION. Deadlines reset as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss and 16 MOTION to Strike. Responses due by 7/25/2016. Replies du e by 8/3/2016. Motion Hearing continued to 9/20/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Case Management Conference continued to 9/20/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/30/2016 (Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2016). (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryde et al v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Bryde
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Waters
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Northington
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Richard Oxford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?