Christopher Seldon v. Dignity Health et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Seldon
Defendant: Dignity Health and Dignity Health Foundation
Case Number: 4:2016cv02454
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/1/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/15/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
November 2, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
August 12, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case filed by Dignity Health, Christopher Seldon, Dignity Health Foundation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/12/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Seldon v. Dignity Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Seldon
Represented By: Steven Leo Derby
Represented By: Celia Louise McGuinness
Represented By: Paul Leslie Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?