Enertrode, Inc. v. General Capacitor Co. Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Enertrode, Inc.
Defendant: General Capacitor Co. Ltd, General Capacitor International, Inc., General Capacitor, LLC and Jianping Zheng
Case Number: 4:2016cv02458
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2017 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 102 Stipulation re docket no. 101 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
May 16, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 85 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 10, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 71 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Preliminary Relief. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
April 3, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 62 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 1, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. CONSOLIDATING CASES Re (36) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-02458-HSG. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 21, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 48 Motion to Appear by Telephone by G. Donovan Conwell. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
January 26, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case to 17-cv-179-VC, General Capacitor International, Inc., et al. v. Linda Zhong. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/25/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 18, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation Re: Extension of Time. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
December 29, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2017; Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2017 02:00 PM.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
November 16, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO CONDUCT MEDIATION re 20 Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
July 15, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
May 17, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enertrode, Inc. v. General Capacitor Co. Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enertrode, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Werner Battin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Capacitor Co. Ltd
Represented By: Charles T.C. Compton
Represented By: George Dononvan Conwell, Jr
Represented By: Perry J. Narancic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Capacitor International, Inc.
Represented By: Charles T.C. Compton
Represented By: George Dononvan Conwell, Jr
Represented By: Perry J. Narancic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Capacitor, LLC
Represented By: Charles T.C. Compton
Represented By: George Dononvan Conwell, Jr
Represented By: Perry J. Narancic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jianping Zheng
Represented By: Charles T.C. Compton
Represented By: Perry J. Narancic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?