Damon Wilson v. Citibank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Damon Wilson
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2016cv02574
Filed: May 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE AND STAY ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/16/2016. Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 14, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 18 19 MOTIONS TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/14/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
September 26, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damon Wilson v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Wilson
Represented By: Jim Gerhart Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?