Robert Joseph Gardner v. William Muniz

Petitioner: Robert Joseph Gardner
Respondent: William Muniz and People of the State of California
Case Number: 4:2016cv02663
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/15/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
September 21, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Robert Joseph Gardner Replies due by 10/26/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
May 31, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Show Cause by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The clerk shall serve by certified mail a copy of this order and 1 petition and all attachments thereto upon respondents. Respondents shall file with the court and serve on petiti oner, within 60 days of the date of this order, an answer conforming in all respects to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, showing cause why a writ of habeas corpus should not be issued. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016) Modified on 5/31/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Joseph Gardner v. William Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Joseph Gardner
Represented By: Robert Joseph Beles
Represented By: Joseph Lanting Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Muniz
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?