Godhigh et al-v-Savers, LLC

Plaintiff: Earl Godhigh and Angela Osgood
Defendant: Savers, LLC, TVI, Inc. and Value Village
Case Number: 4:2016cv02874
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL FLSA CERTIFICATION by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 45 Motion to Certify Class. The parties shall submit an agreed-to notice on or before January 12, 2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
November 15, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 STIPULATION to continue Case Management Conference and hearing as to 45 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2016. Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/10/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
October 14, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Stipulation to Reset Deadlines as to 45 MOTION to Certify Class. Response due by 10/19/2016. Reply due by 11/2/2016. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/14/2016. Case Management Conference is also continued to 11/30/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
September 2, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 15 MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godhigh et al-v-Savers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Godhigh
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Osgood
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Village
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?