Kaplan v. Seterus, Inc.

Plaintiff: Lesley Kaplan
Defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv02940
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part 80 Motion for Summary Judgment and remanding state law claim to the California Superior Court for Contra Costa County. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
July 5, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 9 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying as moot 11 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than July 26, 2016. The hearing previously set for July 29, 2016 is vacated. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 8, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/8/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaplan v. Seterus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesley Kaplan
Represented By: J. Erik Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Matthew Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?