Thy v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Syna Thy
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 4:2016cv03127
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, the Commissioner's motion for summary judgment is DENIED, and this case is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/28/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
December 12, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing deadlines as to 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response due by 1/3/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/12/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
November 16, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND - Reset Deadlines as to 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response due by 12/13/2016.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/16/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thy v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Roya Massoumi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syna Thy
Represented By: Steven Matthew Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?