Gregory Ingalls et al v. Spotify USA Inc.

Plaintiff: Gregory Ingalls and Tony Hong
Defendant: Spotify USA Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv03533
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 105 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Gregory Ingalls. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/12/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 8, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 105 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Gregory Ingalls. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/8/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
August 7, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SEEK CERTIFICATION OF NEWLY-DEFINED CLASS by Hon. William Alsup denying 103 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
July 27, 2017 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CLASS CERTIFICATION AND VACATING EVIDENTIARY HEARING by Hon. William Alsup denying 76 Motion to Certify Class.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 24, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DECLARATION OF GREGORY INGALLS re 98 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Gregory Ingalls Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/24/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 21, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER COMPELLING SPOTIFY TO PROVIDE DOCUMENTS AND SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 95 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Gregory Ingalls. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/21/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 20, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE AND SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING re 93 Declaration in Support filed by Spotify USA Inc. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/20/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 17, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
July 14, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION re 76 MOTION for Class Certification filed by Gregory Ingalls Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/14/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 11, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING INFORMATION Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/11/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 6, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court QUESTION REGARDING FUTURE SPOTIFY SUBSCRIPTION Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/6/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
May 4, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 67 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
May 3, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Hon. William Alsup [terminating 69 Discovery Letter Brief]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 1, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON PARTIES' DISCOVERY DISPUTES [re 69 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Gregory Ingalls, Tony Hong, 66 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Spotify USA Inc.]. Respo nses due by NOON on 5/2/2017. Three-hour meet-and-confer starting from 10:00 AM--1:30 PM (with 30 minutes for lunch at noon) on 5/3/2017 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 5/3/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/1/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 28, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 66 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Spotify USA Inc.]. Response due by 3:00 PM 5/1/2017. Two-hour meet-and-confer from 8:30 AM--10:30 AM 5/2/2017 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 5/2/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/28/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 7, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL RYAN CASEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
February 28, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCLOSURE OF NON-PARTY INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/28/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 27, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/27/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
December 8, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR STAY by Hon. William Alsup denying 45 Motion to Stay.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 28, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR SPOTIFY USA INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 41 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 14, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Hon. William Alsup denying 25 Motion to Compel.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
September 26, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/26/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 8, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING AND EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT'S REPLYSupplemental Response due by 9/14/2016. Reply due by 9/21/2016. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
August 2, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONFOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN PATRICK KILLACKY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
August 1, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 28, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY STEPHEN M. RUMMAGE by Hon. William Alsup denying 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 11, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 1, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory Ingalls et al v. Spotify USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Ingalls
Represented By: Sara Dawn Avila
Represented By: Marc A. Castaneda
Represented By: Derek J Meyer
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Hong
Represented By: Sara Dawn Avila
Represented By: Marc A. Castaneda
Represented By: Derek J Meyer
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify USA Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: Scott Robert Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?