Motha v. Time Warner Cable Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Josslyn Motha
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable Enterprises LLC, Time Warner NY Cable LLC, Charter Communications, Inc and Bank of America NA
Case Number: 4:2016cv03585
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Bank of America NA, Time Warner Cable Enterprises LLC, Time Warner Cable, LLC against Josslyn Motha. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
March 1, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 55 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles Carreon terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
December 2, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
November 3, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Ex Parte Application. Joint Report due by 11/2/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
September 21, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 13 Stipulation Regarding Interim Disposition of Disputed Intellectual Property and Scheduling. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motha v. Time Warner Cable Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner NY Cable LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josslyn Motha
Represented By: Charles Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?