Rodriguez v. Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Rodriguez
Defendant: Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC and Akima, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv03607
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/25/2019. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 54 MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, AND VACATING HEARING.(pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue the Settlement Conference Before The Honorable Kandis A. Westmore from February 3, 2017, to March 27, 2017 filed by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC Settlement Conference set for 3/22/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/1/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/18/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/15/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Rodriguez
Represented By: Donald Joseph Clapp
Represented By: Joseph Clapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akima, LLC
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?