Arabian Gas and Oil Development Company v. Wisdom Marines Lines, S.A., et al

Plaintiff: Arabian Gas and Oil Development Company
Defendant: Wisdom Marines Lines, S.A., Wisdom Marines Lines Co., Ltd. and SAO Wisdom, S.A.
Case Number: 4:2016cv03801
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CIVIL CONTEMPT SANCTIONS by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
June 2, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 81 Motion for Leave to File. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 1, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Denying Plaintiff Arabian Gas and Oil Development Company's Motion to Stay and Holding Request for Civil Contempt in Abeyance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on June 1, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
March 30, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re: 57 Motion to Deposit Funds. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
August 4, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting aside the Right to Attach Order 14 , quashing the writ of attachment 19 against the vessel M/V Global Faith, and releasing the M/V Global Faith from attachment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/04/2016. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 1, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Supplemental Briefing re 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, and in the Alternative to set aside Court's Order Granting Writ of Attachment and the Attachment of the M/V GLOBAL FAITH filed by SAO Wisdom, S.A., Wisdom Marines Lines, S.A., Wisdom Marines Lines Co., Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/01/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 8, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 4 Ex Parte Application.(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arabian Gas and Oil Development Company v. Wisdom Marines Lines, S.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arabian Gas and Oil Development Company
Represented By: Daniel Francis Berberich
Represented By: Frank C Brucculeri
Represented By: George Angelo Gaitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisdom Marines Lines, S.A.
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Beazley
Represented By: Christopher Robert Farnsworth
Represented By: James Arthur Henry Marissen
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisdom Marines Lines Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Beazley
Represented By: Christopher Robert Farnsworth
Represented By: James Arthur Henry Marissen
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAO Wisdom, S.A.
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Beazley
Represented By: Christopher Robert Farnsworth
Represented By: James Arthur Henry Marissen
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?