O'Brien v. XPO Logistics Worldwide, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Raymond F. O'Brien
Defendant: XPO Logistics Worldwide, Inc. and Con-Way Global Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv03869
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/14/17. Show Cause Response due by 8/21/2017.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
June 2, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 70 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 22, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 40 Motion to Set Aside Schedule and for Leave to File Amended Complaint and vacating May 26, 2017 motion hearing. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien v. XPO Logistics Worldwide, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond F. O'Brien
Represented By: Katherine Anne Fosseen Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Knudson
Represented By: Laura J. Maechtlen
Represented By: Africa Reanne Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Con-Way Global Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Knudson
Represented By: Laura J. Maechtlen
Represented By: Africa Reanne Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?